### If 10 @ 70 * 60 # 90 = 4300 and 105 @ 70 * 30 # 85 =2290, then 80 @ 40 * 50 # 60 = ?

a) 2140

b) 2100

c) 2160

d) 2190

**Answer : a) 2140**

SSC GD Exam Paper – General Intelligence and Reasoning

### Solution :

Look at the equations to substitute the symbols with appropriate operator. In this case following will balance the equations.

@ = Addition (+)

* = Multiply (x)

# = Addition (+)

10 @ 70 * 60 # 90 =

=> 10 + (70 x 60) + 90 = 10 + 4200 +90 = 4300

105 @ 70 * 30 # 85 =

=> 105+(70X30)+85 = 105+2100+85 =2290

80 @ 40 * 50 # 60 =

80+(40×50) +60 = 80 + 2000 + 60 = 2140

Correct Answer is 2140